MA H3363 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to renaming the "Copley Station" and the "Science Park Station" by the Massachusetts Bay Transportaion Authority
Title
Renaming the "Copley Station" and the "Science Park Station" by the Massachusetts Bay Transportaion Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Martha Walz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-19 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-05-17 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2010-04-12 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 9/22 at 11:00 AM in Hearing Room A2 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h03363.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht03/ht03363.htm |