MA H3359 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-7)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Representative Khan of Newton, a petition of Kay Khan and others that the Registry of Motor Vehicles design certain envelopes to enhance effective communications and interactions between police officers and persons with autism spectrum disorder. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Facilitating better interactions between police officers and persons with autism spectrum disorder

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-24JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2023-03-13SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S2204 (Similar To) 2024-01-04 - New draft substituted, see S2542
H4028 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
S2542 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4729 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Reporting date extended to Saturday August 31, 2024, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback