MA H3356 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5042
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to executive agency liability in the construction of, or events involving, natural gas pipelines or natural gas compressor stations. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Requiring executive agency liability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5042 |
2021-10-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H1150 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1151 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5003
H3120 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3121 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2487 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
S767 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1063 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S929 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1341 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S2217 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
H5042 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1151 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5003
H3120 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3121 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2487 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
S767 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1063 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S929 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1341 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S2217 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
H5042 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3356 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3356.pdf |