MA H3348 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4134
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide higher education tuition and fee waivers for certain veterans. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to college tuition and fees for veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4134 |
2013-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2013 from 10:30 AM-12:30 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4134 (Replaced by) 2014-06-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3348 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3348.pdf |