MA H3344 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4039
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4039
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4039
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further define the rights and duties of students and creditors relative to student loans. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to the rights of student borrowers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4039 |
2014-02-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 222 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4039 (Replaced by) 2014-04-15 - Reported, in part, by H2861
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3344 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3344.pdf |