MA H3344 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the city of Marlborough to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Marlborough to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2011 |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-06-29 | House | Enacted |
2011-06-27 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2011-06-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-06-22 | Senate | Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-06-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Read and placed in Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-06-13 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-05-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-05-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-05-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-05-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-04-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3344 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=15164&generalCourtId=1 |