MA H3339 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Read and referred to the Joint Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Read and referred to the Joint Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Joseph DeMartino, an employee of the Department of Correction. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Joseph DeMartino, an employee of the Department of Correction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Senate | Read and referred to the Joint Committee on Ways and Means |
2011-04-21 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-04-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-04-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-04-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-04-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-04-04 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
2011-03-29 | House | Referred to the House committee on Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3339 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=15071&generalCourtId=1 |