MA H3322 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5042
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require notification to owners of real estate in areas scheduled for certain public utility construction. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to construction for the installation or repair of utility lines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5042 |
2021-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H5042 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3322 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3322.pdf |