MA H3321 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4715

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4715
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to commuter rail expansion. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commuter rail expansion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-06HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4715
2023-05-08JointLocation Changed - Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-05-05JointHearing rescheduled to 05/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-04-19JointHearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-03-13SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3316 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3908 (Similar To) 2023-06-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2402 (Similar To) 2023-06-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4118 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4715
S2507 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4715 (Replaced by) 2024-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback