MA H3316 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize certain expenditures from the Massachusetts Transportation Trust Fund. Transportation.
Title
Supporting recycling across the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Vega [D] | Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-02-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/10/2016 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3316 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3316.pdf |