MA H331 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Accompanied a study order, H4420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Accompanied a study order, H4420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Stanley of Waltham, a petition of Thomas M. Stanley and others for an investigation by a special commission (including members of the General Court) on the safety and security of deposits made by public entities. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to the safety of public deposits
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Sen. Viriato deMacedo [R] | Rep. John Fernandes [D] |
Rep. Steven Levy [R] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. John Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, H4420 |
2012-01-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/07/2012 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H331 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9424&generalCourtId=1 |