MA H3308 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4244

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to higher education student loan tax deductions. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To reduce graduate student loan debt

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4244
2017-05-26JointHearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S1667 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1480 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4214
S1645 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1524 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1577 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1510 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback