MA H3308 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to further regulating practices of common carriers regarding former business customers. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Regulating practices of common carriers regarding former business customers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4324 |
2015-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2747 (Similar To) 2016-04-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2016
H3007 (Similar To) 2015-10-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2923 (Similar To) 2015-12-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H386 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4143
H3188 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2015
H3007 (Similar To) 2015-10-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2923 (Similar To) 2015-12-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H386 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4143
H3188 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2015
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3308 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3308.pdf |