MA H3308 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4454

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression
Action: 2012-09-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the payment of certain burial expenses for veterans. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to veterans' burial expenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-27HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4454
2011-03-21JointHearing scheduled for 03/23/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2011-01-24SenateSenate concurred
2011-01-24HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H4454 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback