MA H3283 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the hiring preferences for veterans and surviving children of police officers and fire fighters who died in the line of duty. Public Service.
Title
Protecting veterans and children of those officers and firefighters that gave their last full measure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2017-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1437 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1473 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1817 (Similar To) 2017-05-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1373 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1374 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1473 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1817 (Similar To) 2017-05-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1373 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1374 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3283 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3283.pdf |