MA H3263 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure full participation by citizens and organizations in discussion of issues regarding the right to the freedom of petition, the freedom of speech, the freedom of expression or any matter of public concern. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to strengthen the Commonwealth's Anti-SLAPP law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18SenateSenate concurred
2020-05-11HouseReporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-10SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-09-10JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback