MA H326 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4453
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for pay by the mile motor vehicle insurance. Financial Services.
Title
Providing consumer choice and environmental protection by authorizing pay by the mile auto insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-27 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4453 |
2011-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4453 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H326 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8403&generalCourtId=1 |