MA H3243 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4282
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4282
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4282
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to including water piping in the lead law. Public Health.
Title
To amend the lead law to include water piping
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4282 |
2017-09-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4282 (Replaced by) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3243 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3243.pdf |