MA H3236 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H1954
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Accompanied H1954
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Accompanied H1954
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to autism training for medical specialists. Public Health.
Title
Creating autism teams in hospitals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | Accompanied H1954 |
2017-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S287 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2348
S1221 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S646 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied H2209
S695 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2467
H1954 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1221 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S646 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied H2209
S695 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2467
H1954 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3236 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3236.pdf |