MA H3232 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H587
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to election record keeping. Election Laws.
Title
To modernize election record keeping
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-05-19 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-02-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-02-11 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-02-11 | House | Accompanied by H587 |
2015-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2015 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H587 (Replaces) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied H3232
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3232 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3232.pdf |