MA H3216 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4512
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - New draft substituted, see H4512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - New draft substituted, see H4512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minimum age requirements for obtaining identification cards
Title
Relative to minimum age requirement for obtaining identification cards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | New draft substituted, see H4512 | |
2010-03-22 | Read second | |
2010-03-15 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending | |
2010-02-22 | Referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending | |
2010-02-22 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a bill with the same title, see H4512 | |
2010-01-25 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Committee On Ways and Means | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4512 (Replaced by) 2010-07-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 184 of the Acts of 2010
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H3216 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=5874&generalCourtId=2 |