MA H3207 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4624
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certified alcohol and drug free housing. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To ensure safe living conditions in sober homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4624 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 20, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-08-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H1074 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H4466 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4586
H4624 (Replaced by) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4466 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4586
H4624 (Replaced by) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3207 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3207.pdf |