MA H3207 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2034
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2034
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2034
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Title: Resolutions to protect consumers and enforce the Fair Credit Reporting Act By Mr. Sannicandro of Ashland, a petition of Tom Sannicandro and Elizabeth A. Malia memorializing the President of the United States and Congress to require consumer reporting agencies to meet the standards of the Fair Credit Reporting Act. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Resolutions to protect consumers and enforce the Fair Credit Reporting Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2034 |
2013-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2013 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2034 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3207 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3207.pdf |