MA H3199 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4585
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the cultivation of marijuana and marihuana. Marijuana Policy.
Title
Repealing section 1-3 and 7-18 of Chapter 351 of the acts of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4585 |
2018-01-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2018 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Marijuana Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S99 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2413
S138 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S1205 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2184
S1270 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H3195 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H887 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H111 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1012 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H200 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H424 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H744 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4585 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S138 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S1205 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2184
S1270 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H3195 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H887 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H111 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1012 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H200 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H424 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H744 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4585 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3199 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3199.pdf |