MA H3199 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4214
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4214
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4214
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Andover be authorized to provide property tax relief for certain elderly residents of said town. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing for limited property tax relief for certain elder citizens in the town of Andover
Sponsors
Rep. James Lyons [R] | Rep. Frank Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4214 |
2015-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4214 (Replaced by) 2016-07-23 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H104 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H105 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H431 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4600
H579 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H1054 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
H104 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H105 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H431 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4600
H579 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H1054 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3199 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3199.pdf |