MA H3196 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the reimbursement of cities and towns for veterans' benefits. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Providing for timely reimbursement of cities and towns for veterans’ benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Blais [D] | Rep. Peter Capano [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] |
Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
Rep. Aaron Vega [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H1393 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H1393 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3196 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3196.pdf |