MA H3193 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4778

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to aggregated gas power. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to aggregated gas power

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-02HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4778
2024-03-28SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-08-30JointHearing scheduled for 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-07-07JointHearing rescheduled to 10/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-06-06JointHearing scheduled for 09/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H4239 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Report accepted, in concurrence
H4498 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2827 (Similar To) 2024-06-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
H4788 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4778 (Replaced by) 2024-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback