MA H3191 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Williamsburg be authorized to continue the employment of fire fighter Paul Sanderson, not withstanding the maximum age requirement. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Williamsburg to continue the employment of firefighter Paul Sanderson
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-08-31 | House | Enacted |
2015-08-27 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2015-08-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2015-08-03 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2015-08-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-06-29 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2015-06-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-06-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-06-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-05-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3191 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3191.pdf |