MA H3188 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4778

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to Class I renewable energy generating sources. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to hydro

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-02HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4778
2024-03-28SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-07-11JointLocation Changed - Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-07-11JointLocation Changed - Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 07/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-06-06JointHearing scheduled for 07/13/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S2529 (Similar To) 2024-06-17 - Accompanied S2531
S2558 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4778 (Replaced by) 2024-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback