MA H3184 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4485
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4485
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4485
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of private contractors to provide certain public services. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the study of the Pacheco law
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4485 |
2021-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4485 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3184 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3184.pdf |