MA H3178 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish within the Executive Office of Energy and Environmental Affairs a lithium-ion car vehicle battery advisory group. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to lithium-ion batteries
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] |
Rep. Kelly Pease [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2024-04-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-05-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H1837 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
S1974 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - House concurred
H4438 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1974 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - House concurred
H4438 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3178 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3178.pdf |