MA H3178 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2167
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to inland fisheries and game licenses By Mr. Binienda of Worcester, a petition of John J. Binienda and Michael O. Moore that certain disabled veterans be exempt from inland fisheries and game fees. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to inland fisheries and game licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2167 |
2014-03-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2014 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2167 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3178 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3178.pdf |