MA H317 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4641
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require hand sanitizer dispensers in schools. Education.
Title
Requiring hand sanitizer dispensers in schools
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Silvia [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Rep. Carole Fiola [D] |
Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. James O'Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4641 |
2017-08-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/05/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H288 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H262 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4127
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H256 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2113 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Reprinted as amended, see S2128
S2128 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4257 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4692
S2343 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2374
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2374 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 438 of the Acts of 2018
H4641 (Replaced by) 2018-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H262 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4127
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H256 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2113 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Reprinted as amended, see S2128
S2128 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4257 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4692
S2343 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2374
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2374 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 438 of the Acts of 2018
H4641 (Replaced by) 2018-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H317 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H317.pdf |