MA H3161 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to offshore wind. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Strengthening Massachusetts as the national leader in offshore wind

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-16JointHearing scheduled for 05/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-05-15JointHearing scheduled for 05/18/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S506 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
S2169 (Similar To) 2023-05-16 - Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H3147 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence
S2182 (Similar To) 2023-05-16 - Hearing scheduled for 05/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H848 (Similar To) 2023-05-10 - Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback