MA H3113 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Scanlon of North Attleborough, a petition of Adam Scanlon that state or municipal agencies or authorities give preference to materials and goods manufactured in the United States. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To promote American manufacturing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2023 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3108 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence
S583 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Accompanied S511
S1981 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence
S1523 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
H4235 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S583 (Similar To) 2024-01-18 - Accompanied S511
S1981 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence
S1523 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
H4235 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3113 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3113.pdf |