MA H310 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4880
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring notification of fraud by the Division of Professional Licensure and boards of registration. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to notification of fraud
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Balser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4880 |
2021-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S1130 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S727 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1026 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H3142 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2090 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2086 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
H4880 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S727 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1026 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H3142 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2090 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2086 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
H4880 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H310 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H310.pdf |