MA H3097 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to furnishing alcoholic beverages to persons under twenty-one years of age. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the social host law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-08-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H152 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S160 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S164 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1560 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1990 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H25 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S160 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S164 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1560 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1990 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H25 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3097 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3097.pdf |