MA H308 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to restrict sales of certain items and products at flea markets, so-called. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Restricting the sale of certain items at flea markets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/24/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H2756 (Similar To) 2023-05-11 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
S2380 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Accompanied H3741
H2826 (Similar To) 2023-09-06 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H3916 (Similar To) 2023-06-15 - Adopted
S2380 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Accompanied H3741
H2826 (Similar To) 2023-09-06 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H3916 (Similar To) 2023-06-15 - Adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H308 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H308.pdf |