MA H3065 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to penalties for indecent assault and battery on minors under the age fourteen. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to consensual adolescent sexual activity
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-11-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H986 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H985 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H982 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H983 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H626 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H986 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H985 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H982 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H983 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3065 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3065.pdf |