MA H3064 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4465
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require telephone companies to enlarge the type size of printing used in telephone directories
Title
To require telephone companies serving the residents of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts to enlarge the type size of the printing used in the telephone directories
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4465 |
2011-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/04/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H4465 (Replaced by) 2012-10-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3064 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9936&generalCourtId=1 |