MA H3062 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the procuring of information technology goods or services by state agencies. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to cyber procurement projects
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3062 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3062.pdf |