MA H3060 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize regional transit authorities to establish enterprise funds. Transportation.
Title
To establish regional transit authority enterprise fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-12-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/06/2016 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3299 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3300 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2648 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2031 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Senate concurred
H2030 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H3300 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2648 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2031 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Senate concurred
H2030 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3060 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3060.pdf |