MA H306 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2565

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to credit card surcharges. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to cardholder surcharges

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-26SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2565
2023-07-17JointHearing scheduled for 07/24/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S2565 (Replaced by) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1044 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4691
H1101 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1058 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4691
H2933 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4727
H260 (Similar To) 2024-01-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2565

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback