MA H304 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to clinically appropriate ongoing short term treatment, assessment and reassessment health care observation services coverage and assistance. Financial Services.
Title
To define the use of observation services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-06-18 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-05-03 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2011-11-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H304 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11113&generalCourtId=1 |