MA H3036 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to civil commitment proceedings for alcohol and substance abuse treatment. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to civil commitment for alcohol and substance abuse treatment
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Calter [D] | Rep. Josh Cutler [D] | Sen. Viriato deMacedo [R] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-08-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3047 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H3048 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3048 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3036 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3036.pdf |