MA H3033 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4772
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to driver education and training reform. Transportation.
Title
To establish driver education and training reform
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] |
Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4772 |
2020-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3041 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3062 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S1704 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H4772 (Replaced by) 2020-06-08 - Reported, in part, by H3014
H3062 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S1704 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H4772 (Replaced by) 2020-06-08 - Reported, in part, by H3014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3033 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3033.pdf |