MA H3020 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2014 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2014 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to operating a motor vehicle under the influence of inhalants. Transportation.
Title
Prohibiting operating a motor vehicle under the influence of inhalants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2014 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-05 | House | Discharged to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
2013-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2013 from 01:30 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3020 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3020.pdf |