MA H3019 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Health
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Health
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to bicycle safety and fluorescent clothing. Transportation.
Title
Relative to bicycle safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2019-03-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3019 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3019.pdf |