MA H3009 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to beneficiary designation on motor vehicle registrations. Transportation.
Title
Relative to beneficiary designation on motor vehicle registration
Sponsors
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Leonard Mirra [R] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
Rep. Maria Robinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-12-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H2975 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H1074 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H2975 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H1074 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3009 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3009.pdf |