MA H3004 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to making Presidential election days state holidays. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to making Election Day a state holiday
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2059 (Similar To) 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H3124 (Similar To) 2023-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2000 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3124 (Similar To) 2023-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2000 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3004 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3004.pdf |